WebNew figures published today have shown the Gender Pay Gap at LSBU has fallen by 25% in a year. Marcelle Moncrieffe-Johnson, LSBU Group Chief People Officer, “The 25% fall is welcome, but we know ... WebHILARY MCCALLION CBE Trustee at South Bank Academies Trust 1y Report this post Report Report. Back Submit. London South Bank University 120,953 followers 1y This academic year (2024/21) marks 100 ...
Register of Interests 2024
WebHilary McCallion Hilary McCallion Consultancy Limited Healthcare Consultancy Owner and director (remunerated) 2013 London South Bank University Higher Education Independent governor and visiting professor Chris Mallaband None Fiona Morey South Bank Colleges Further Education Executive Principal 2024 WebA specialist in developing individual and team potential in healthcare teams Hilary McCallion draws on a wealth of knowledge and expertise gained during a career in the NHS; … Hilary McCallion Consultancy offers: Executive coaching/group coaching. … Facilitators Prof. Hilary McCallion and Peter Hasler understand the challenges of … If you would like to talk to Hilary McCallion about the work of Hilary McCallion … Leadership in Care in-house programmes are led and facilitated by Professor Hilary … Leadership in Care - National Programme. This exciting and inspiring programme, … calf and heel pain
Hilary McLaurin - Clinical Analyst - First Health LinkedIn
WebTo find a full address and telephone number for Hilary McCallion Consultancy Limited, use our business telephone directory. Company information available. You can also lookup … WebCompany HILARY MCCALLION CONSULTANCY LIMITED is a Private Limited Company, registration number 08472732, established in United Kingdom on the 4. April 2013. The company is now active. The company has been in business for 9 years and 3 months. The company is based on 191-193 HIGH STREET, HAMPTON HILL, MIDDLESEX, UNITED … WebHilary Mccallion Consultancy Limited: Consultant: Director: 4 April 2013: ACTIVE: National Mental Health Nurse Directors Forum: Director Of Nursing & Educatio: Director: 26 June 2007 — 3 December 2010: RESIGNED. Dementia UK: Professor: Director: 20 January 2014 — 31 July 2024: RESIGNED. calf and heifer association